NY S03472 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants uniformed court officers in the village of Palmyra in the county of Wayne peace officer status.
Title
Grants uniformed court officers in the village of Palmyra in the county of Wayne peace officer status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3472A |
2019-05-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2019-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06089 (Same As) 2020-02-05 - amended on third reading 6089b