NY S03461 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that bicycle operators and the businesses affiliated with such operators shall be liable for such operator's failure to carry an identification card or certain other violations regarding the use of a bicycle for commercial purposes; changes violations for the failure to carry an identification card or certain other violation procedures and fines by a commercial bicycle operator.
Title
Provides that bicycle operators and the businesses affiliated with such operators shall be liable for such operator's failure to carry an identification card or certain other violations regarding the use of a bicycle for commercial purposes; changes violations for the failure to carry an identification card or certain other violation procedures and fines by a commercial bicycle operator.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.541 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3461B |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED 3461A |
2013-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.926 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00224 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to cities