NY S03446 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 3446A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 3446A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the unified economic development budget act.
Title
Enacts the unified economic development budget act.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3446A |
2014-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2013-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06542 (Same As) 2014-02-05 - print number 6542a