NY S03411 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
Pending: Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
Pending: Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires animal shelters to annually report on intake and disposition of animals and the number of animals turned away by such shelters; requires shelters to submit such reports to the department of agriculture and markets, and requires such department to post the reports on their website.
Title
Requires animal shelters to annually report on intake and disposition of animals and the number of animals turned away by such shelters; requires shelters to submit such reports to the department of agriculture and markets, and requires such department to post the reports on their website.
Sponsors
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3411A |
2019-04-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2019-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
Same As/Similar To
A04245 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture