NY S03375 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a minor over twelve years of age to work as a referee for athletic games or competitions under certain circumstances.
Title
Permits a minor over twelve years of age to work as a referee for athletic games or competitions under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.438 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.519 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A02666 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to labor