NY S03370 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3076
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3076
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the qualifications of members of the gaming commission.
Title
Relates to the qualifications of members of the gaming commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3076 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1751 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2017-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A03076 (Same As) 2018-10-02 - signed chap.308