NY S03353 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2852A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2852A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires municipalities to maintain municipal websites.
Title
Requires municipalities to maintain municipal websites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2852A |
2024-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1564 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3353A |
2024-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-04-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02852 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY