NY S03344 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the professional certification of doulas; only those certified may provide doula services defined as continuous emotional and physical support provided by a certified doula throughout labor and birth, and intermittently during the prenatal and postpartum periods.
Title
Authorizes the professional certification of doulas; only those certified may provide doula services defined as continuous emotional and physical support provided by a certified doula throughout labor and birth, and intermittently during the prenatal and postpartum periods.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-13 | Senate | vetoed memo.195 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.243 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3344B |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.315 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.315 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-30 | Senate | print number 364b |
2019-05-30 | Senate | amend and recommit to health |
2019-04-17 | Senate | print number 364a |
2019-04-17 | Senate | amend and recommit to health |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A364B |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3344B |
2019-06-05 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-05 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3344A |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.243 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A00364 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - tabled