NY S03344 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases access to substance abuse programming for prisoners whose first language is not English.
Title
Increases access to substance abuse programming for prisoners whose first language is not English.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2017-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03192 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - reported referred to ways and means