NY A03192 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases access to substance abuse programming for prisoners whose first language is not English.
Title
Increases access to substance abuse programming for prisoners whose first language is not English.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03344 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE