NY S03343 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to protecting public health and sanitarian enforcement workers from assault.
Title
Relates to protecting public health and sanitarian enforcement workers from assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.472 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.672 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7542 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1160 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07542 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s3343