NY S03315 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring a local referendum prior to legislative action taken to alienate parkland.
Title
Relates to requiring a local referendum prior to legislative action taken to alienate parkland.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.163 |
2011-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |