NY S03230 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3230A
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3230A
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the community chemical dependence services expansion program; provides funding for local governmental units for the provision of new and expanded chemical dependency services.
Title
Establishes the community chemical dependence services expansion program; provides funding for local governmental units for the provision of new and expanded chemical dependency services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3230A |
2016-02-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2015-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A00743 (Same As) 2016-02-12 - print number 743a