NY S03228 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the metropolitan transportation authority providing signs that would give the public immediate instruction on how to react to a fall onto the transit facility tracks.
Title
Relates to the metropolitan transportation authority providing signs that would give the public immediate instruction on how to react to a fall onto the transit facility tracks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.253 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a3281a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 3228A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1075 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03281 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - amended on third reading 3281b