NY S03225 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A358
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A358
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the collection of certain demographic information about the sexual orientation and gender identity or expression of residents by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Title
Requires the collection of certain demographic information about the sexual orientation and gender identity or expression of residents by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A358 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1276 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00358 (Same As) 2023-11-21 - approval memo.34