NY S03221 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to university police officers appointed by the state university of New York.
Title
Relates to university police officers appointed by the state university of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-18 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.21 |
2015-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.561 |
2015-12-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.341 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a4519 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1272 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04519 (Same As) 0000-00-00 -