NY S03213 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a one time fee of one hundred dollars for the registration of historic motor vehicles.
Title
Provides a one time fee of one hundred dollars for the registration of historic motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1274 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-06-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1495 |
2011-06-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02080 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to transportation