NY S03191 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the mandatory revocation of a driver's license for certain convictions under the penal law, followed by a period of one year of operating with a post-revocation conditional license.
Title
Provides for the mandatory revocation of a driver's license for certain convictions under the penal law, followed by a period of one year of operating with a post-revocation conditional license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1758 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1810 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00038 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation