NY S03184 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - VETOED MEMO.72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - VETOED MEMO.72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to procedures, practices and standards for actions by the office of medicaid inspector general and social services districts.
Title
Relates to procedures, practices and standards for actions by the office of medicaid inspector general and social services districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.72 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.602 |
2011-06-23 | Assembly | substituted for a5686a |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1381 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3184A |
2011-06-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2011-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05686 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - substituted by s3184a