NY S03163 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to small business savings accounts; provides tax incentives for contributions and distributions.
Title
Relates to small business savings accounts; provides tax incentives for contributions and distributions.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.176 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06706 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - enacting clause stricken
A07693 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
A07693 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means