NY S03153 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the training requirements for peace officers; creates a waiver of these requirements for federal law enforcement officers.
Title
Relates to the training requirements for peace officers; creates a waiver of these requirements for federal law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2018-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.218 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2017-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.589 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00345 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to economic development