NY S03138 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes utility corporations, telegraph and telephone corporations, and cable television corporations to provide notice of bills to third parties at the request of the customer.
Title
Authorizes utility corporations, telegraph and telephone corporations, and cable television corporations to provide notice of bills to third parties at the request of the customer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-17 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3138B |
2022-03-28 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3138A |
2022-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.712 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00422 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions