NY S03111 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a certificate of still birth.
Title
Relates to establishing a certificate of still birth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.552 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.345 |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a8178a |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2011-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3111B |
2011-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3111A |
2011-06-06 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-06 | Senate | returned to senate |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.279 |
2011-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03453 (Same As) 2012-04-17 - enacting clause stricken
A08178 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - substituted by s3111b
A08178 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - substituted by s3111b