NY S03082 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to fund and conduct the empire state games on an annual basis.
Title
Directs the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to fund and conduct the empire state games on an annual basis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1134 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08188 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development