NY S03034 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.161
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.161
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to utility intervenor reimbursement.
Title
Relates to utility intervenor reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.161 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.437 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted for a873a |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2022-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.858 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2021-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3034A |
2021-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.906 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00873 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - substituted by s3034a