NY S03023 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1094A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1094A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for a gift to the love your library fund on corporate and personal income tax return forms.
Title
Allows for a gift to the love your library fund on corporate and personal income tax return forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1094A |
2017-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2204 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3023A |
2017-05-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01094 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - signed chap.174