NY S03011 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - VETOED MEMO.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - VETOED MEMO.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation and the office of mental health to conduct a study pertaining to a proposed expansion of the Long Island Motor Parkway trail.
Title
Authorizes the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation and the office of mental health to conduct a study pertaining to a proposed expansion of the Long Island Motor Parkway trail.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.74 |
2023-11-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.487 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a2252 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1274 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02252 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - substituted by s3011