NY S02994 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to provide educational and support services to students with disabilities until such students turn twenty-three years of age.
Title
Requires school districts to provide educational and support services to students with disabilities until such students turn twenty-three years of age.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2021-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2994A |
2021-03-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2021-03-04 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01201 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to education