NY S02992 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the New York state climate leadership and community protection act; relates to climate change; renewable energy program; labor and job standards and worker protection.
Title
Enacts the New York state climate leadership and community protection act; relates to climate change; renewable energy program; labor and job standards and worker protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2992B |
2019-06-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2992A |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03876 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means