NY S02973 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent provisions creating a presumption relating to certain lung disabilities incurred by volunteer firefighters.
Title
Makes permanent provisions creating a presumption relating to certain lung disabilities incurred by volunteer firefighters.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. John Mannion [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2022-03-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.356 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.290 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |