NY S02973 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that disabled persons may utilize a crossbow in the taking of big game or small game, provided that they submit their disability status to the department.
Title
Provides that disabled persons may utilize a crossbow in the taking of big game or small game, provided that they submit their disability status to the department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2012-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1273 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2011-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1369 |
2011-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00469 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to environmental conservation