NY S02959 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of "public body" to include any entity created or appointed to perform a necessary function in the decision-making process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends the definition of "public body" to include any entity created or appointed to perform a necessary function in the decision-making process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2019-04-10SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-05SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2959A
2019-03-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-27Senate1ST REPORT CAL.174
2019-01-31SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00526 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - print number 526a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback