NY S02949 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires landlords to mitigate damages if a tenant vacates a premises in violation of the terms of the lease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires landlords to mitigate damages if a tenant vacates a premises in violation of the terms of the lease.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-27Senate1ST REPORT CAL.187
2019-01-31SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A01973 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - advanced to third reading cal.26

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback