NY S02942 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to frozen desserts micro-business; permits manufacturers of frozen desserts to use shared-use kitchens; establishes a frozen desserts micro-business grant program.
Title
Relates to frozen desserts micro-business; permits manufacturers of frozen desserts to use shared-use kitchens; establishes a frozen desserts micro-business grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2942A |
2021-05-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |