NY S02935 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain engineering plans or specifications for engineering work or services that could pose a material risk to public safety to bear a stamp of approval of a professional engineer and authorizes the public service commission to promulgate rules and regulations relating to such requirement.
Title
Requires certain engineering plans or specifications for engineering work or services that could pose a material risk to public safety to bear a stamp of approval of a professional engineer and authorizes the public service commission to promulgate rules and regulations relating to such requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.475 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2935A |
2019-04-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06557 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education