NY S02918 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a real property tax exemption for the primary residence of veterans with a 100 percent service connected disability.
Title
Establishes a real property tax exemption for the primary residence of veterans with a 100 percent service connected disability.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] |
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] | Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2022-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.804 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2918A |
2022-04-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-05-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.681 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A00681 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - print number 681a