NY A00681 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - print number 681a
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - print number 681a
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a real property tax exemption for the primary residence of veterans with a 100 percent service connected disability.
Title
Establishes a real property tax exemption for the primary residence of veterans with a 100 percent service connected disability.
Sponsors
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] | Asm. Colin Schmitt [R] | Asm. Michael Lawler [R] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] |
Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 681a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S02918 (Same As) 2022-05-03 - referred to real property taxation