NY S02905 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit for the purchase and installation of geothermal energy systems.
Title
Establishes a tax credit for the purchase and installation of geothermal energy systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Marc Panepinto [D] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.251 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.468 |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a2177a |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-04-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-04-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-04-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.351 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02177 (Same As) 2015-06-01 - substituted by s2905