NY S02899 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that rules that require changes to compliance or billing standards that could result in eventual withholdings or takebacks due to Medicaid auditing and/or self-disclosure obligations shall become effective no sooner than ninety days from the publication of adoption of the rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that rules that require changes to compliance or billing standards that could result in eventual withholdings or takebacks due to Medicaid auditing and/or self-disclosure obligations shall become effective no sooner than ninety days from the publication of adoption of the rules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2019-04-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-27Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-26Senate1ST REPORT CAL.320
2019-01-30SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS

Same As/Similar To

A06059 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - referred to governmental operations

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback