NY S02899 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to property tax credits for farmers; adds property owned in trust to which a taxpayer is a beneficiary to qualified agricultural property.
Title
Relates to property tax credits for farmers; adds property owned in trust to which a taxpayer is a beneficiary to qualified agricultural property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.52 |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.485 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.330 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a4650 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1622 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04650 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - substituted by s2899