NY S02861 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain mandatory medical education requirements; requires mandatory coursework or training relating to prescription pain medication and opiate-dependent patients.
Title
Relates to certain mandatory medical education requirements; requires mandatory coursework or training relating to prescription pain medication and opiate-dependent patients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2013-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH |
2013-04-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2861A |
2013-04-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2013-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03360 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to higher education