NY S02857 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the collection of DNA samples of designated offenders, retention and confidentiality of DNA samples, collection and the preservation of biological evidence, and the establishment of the commission for exoneration review.
Title
Relates to the collection of DNA samples of designated offenders, retention and confidentiality of DNA samples, collection and the preservation of biological evidence, and the establishment of the commission for exoneration review.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2857B |
2011-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2857A |
2011-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.581 |
2011-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03267 (Same As) 2012-01-18 - enacting clause stricken