NY S02839 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a public information and education program for soil and water conservation districts and relates to the spread of invasive disease.
Title
Authorizes a public information and education program for soil and water conservation districts and relates to the spread of invasive disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2012-04-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-04-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.459 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2011-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-23 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 2839A |
2011-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.242 |
2011-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03555 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to environmental conservation