NY S02821 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for temporary disability insurance and paid family leave benefits; makes conforming technical changes.
Title
Expands eligibility for temporary disability insurance and paid family leave benefits; makes conforming technical changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2821B |
2024-01-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1334 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2821A |
2023-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A04053 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - print number 4053b