NY S02821 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain officers of the department of correction and the department of sanitation of the city of New York from training requirements for security guards; designates correction officers of New York city as peace officers.
Title
Exempts certain officers of the department of correction and the department of sanitation of the city of New York from training requirements for security guards; designates correction officers of New York city as peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2016-05-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.603 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2015-05-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.167 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07852 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to economic development