NY S02809 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the insurance coverage of the synchronization of multiple prescriptions and dispensing fee standardization.
Title
Provides for the insurance coverage of the synchronization of multiple prescriptions and dispensing fee standardization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2015-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2809A |
2015-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2015-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04036 (Same As) 2016-05-16 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE