VA HB588 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; fire or casualty damage; termination by landlord. Requires a landlord, prior to giving a tenant 21 days' notice of his intention to terminate the rental agreement for a dwelling unit that has been damaged or destroyed by fire or casualty, to (i) make a reasonable effort to meet with the tenant to discuss reasonable alternatives and to offer the tenant a substantially similar unit, if one is available, or (ii) determine that the damage was caused by the tenant's failure to maintain the dwelling unit in accordance with certain provisions. Current law allows the landlord to terminate such agreement by giving the tenant 14 days' notice of his intention to terminate on the basis of the landlord's determination that such damage requires the removal of the tenant and that the use of the premises is substantially impaired. The bill requires the landlord, upon receiving a request from the tenant after the tenant has received such notice, to reevaluate the extent of damage and habitability of such unit unless the landlord has determined that the damage was caused by the tenant's failure to maintain the dwelling unit. Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; fire or casualty damage; termination by landlord. Requires a landlord, prior to giving a tenant 21 days' notice of his intention to terminate the rental agreement for a dwelling unit that has been damaged or destroyed by fire or casualty, to (i) make a reasonable effort to meet with the tenant to discuss reasonable alternatives and to offer the tenant a substantially similar unit, if one is available, or (ii) determine that the damage was caused by the tenant's failure to maintain the dwelling unit in accordance with certain provisions. Current law allows the landlord to terminate such agreement by giving the tenant 14 days' notice of his intention to terminate on the basis of the landlord's determination that such damage requires the removal of the tenant and that the use of the premises is substantially impaired. The bill requires the landlord, upon receiving a request from the tenant after the tenant has received such notice, to reevaluate the extent of damage and habitability of such unit unless the landlord has determined that the damage was caused by the tenant's failure to maintain the dwelling unit.
Title
VA Residential Landlord &Tenant Act; fire/casualty damage, landlord requirements for termination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 29-N) (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 29-N) (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 17, 2024 | |
2024-04-17 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2024-04-17 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (0-Y 100-N) |
2024-03-09 | House | Passed by until Reconvene, Wednesday, April 17, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-03-08 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB588ER) |
2024-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (69-Y 29-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (69-Y 29-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (69-Y 29-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB588H1 |
2024-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106219D-H1 |
2024-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106219D-H1 |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104482D |