NY S02793 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 2793A
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 2793A
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to use of personal confidential information received from veterans or family members of veterans receiving services from the state and political subdivisions thereof.
Title
Relates to use of personal confidential information received from veterans or family members of veterans receiving services from the state and political subdivisions thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] |
Sen. George Latimer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2793A |
2016-06-03 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2015-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A05514 (Same As) 2016-03-16 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS