NY S02791 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds an optional section to voter registration forms to allow for email addresses.
Title
Adds an optional section to voter registration forms to allow for email addresses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.456 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.317 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01949 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS