NY S02789 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a candidate to designate a committee of not less than 3 persons to appoint and remove the treasurer of his or her campaign committee.
Title
Authorizes a candidate to designate a committee of not less than 3 persons to appoint and remove the treasurer of his or her campaign committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.497 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2013-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1147 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00395 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to election law